Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:J Phil Gilbert
Case #: 3:25-cv-00696
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Petitioner
William Charles Graham
Respondent
T Lillard

GPO Apr 24 2025
the Court $200.00 as a sanction for filing this frivolous § 2241 petition challenging his conviction or sentence in United States v. Graham, No. 0:19-cr-00185-SRN-KMM-2. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/24/2025. (jdh)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DISMISSES with prejudice Graham's petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 (Doc. 1) and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. The Court ORDERS that Graham shall pay
GPO Apr 24 2025
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/24/2025. (jdh)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 04/24 12:33 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/24/2025. (jdh)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 04/24 12:18 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DISMISSES with prejudice Graham's petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 (Doc. 1) and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. The Court ORDERS that Graham shall pay the Court $200.00 as a sanction for filing this frivolous § 2241 petition challenging his conviction or sentence in United States v. Graham, No. 0:19-cr-00185-SRN-KMM-2. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/24/2025. (jdh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 utility Case Opening Notification Tue 04/22 3:21 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 25-696-JPG. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (jaj)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 04/22 3:17 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William Charles Graham.(jaj)
Related: [-]