New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:25-cv-03348
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 6:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Colgate-Palmolive Company
Plaintiff
Rebecca Brower
Represented By
Lori Gwen Feldman
George Feldman Mcdonald PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 04/29 8:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Colgate-Palmolive Company served on 4/25/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. Service was accepted by Jasmine, Intake Specialist at CT Corporation. Document filed by Rebecca Brower..(Feldman, Lori)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 10:18 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 6 MOTION for Rebecca A. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30997621. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California, not state bar;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 8:42 PM
MOTION for Rebecca A. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30997621. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rebecca Brower..(Peterson, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Rebecca A. Peterson in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit R. Peterson CA Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit R. Peterson MN Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 04/25 9:37 AM
ORDER : Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 10, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel should call (855) 244-8681 at the scheduled time. The attendee ID number is 23128287066. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 7/10/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/24/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 12:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Colgate-Palmolive Company..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/23 12:31 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/23 12:32 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/23 12:32 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 04/23 12:33 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lori Gwen Feldman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/22 5:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rebecca Brower..(Feldman, Lori)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/22 5:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Feldman, Lori)
Related: [-]
1 1 49 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 5:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-30969866)Document filed by Rebecca Brower..(Feldman, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Lead Safe Mama Toothpaste Chart,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- individual test results for Colgate