Phoenix Assurance, LLC v. Medical Group Care, LLC
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sheryl H Lipman |
Referred: | Charmiane G Claxton |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02439 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 5:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
Medical Group Care, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Phoenix Assurance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phoenix Assurance, LLC as to Medical Group Care, LLC. (Cornish, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons Issued as to Medical Group Care, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() AMENDED DOCUMENT by Phoenix Assurance, LLC. Proposed Summons for Issuance . (Cornish, Robert) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency Notice
Wed 04/23 11:59 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document1 Complaint, filed by Phoenix Assurance, LLC has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: summons attached only has one page. Please resubmit with both pages of the summons included. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mf) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Courtesy Notice
Wed 04/23 11:56 AM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document1 Complaint, filed by Phoenix Assurance, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note civil cover sheet should be signed using an electronic signature. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. (mf) |
|
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/23 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form (form AO 85) is available on the US Courts website at https://www.uscourts.gov/forms-rules/forms. (mf) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Wed 04/23 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mf) |
|
4 | 4
notice
ADR Compliance
Wed 04/23 11:57 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mf) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (mf) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Medical Group Care, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4671747), filed by Phoenix Assurance, LLC.(Cornish, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |