Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:25-cv-00609
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 5:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Broadcom, Inc.
Plaintiff
Alpha Modus Ventures, LLC
Represented By
Christopher E. Hanba
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 12:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ARIANA DESKINS PELLEGRINO. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/02 3:33 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher E. Hanba Pro Hac Vice Motion of Ariana Deskins Pellegrino ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20130742) by on behalf of Alpha Modus Ventures, LLC. (Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/30 5:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alpha Modus Ventures, LLC. Broadcom, Inc. served on 4/30/2025, answer due 5/21/2025. (Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Broadcom, Inc. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/29 2:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alpha Modus Ventures, LLC. to Broadcom, Inc. (Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Wed 04/23 9:47 AM
Pro Hac Vice Letter to Ariana D. Pellegrino. (kp)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Broadcom, Inc.. (kp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 04/22 5:19 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/22 5:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alpha Modus Ventures, LLC. to Broadcom, Inc. (Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-20078751), filed by Alpha Modus Ventures, LLC.(Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 11,108,591,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - US Patent 11,310,077,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - US Patent 11,303,473,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/23 9:45 AM
Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 04/23 9:45 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 04/23 9:46 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alpha Modus Ventures, LLC. (kp)
Related: [-]