Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:25-cv-00708
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/28 8:46 AM
ORDER. File an IFP Application on the approved form with the three supporting documents or Pay the $55.00 filing fee by 6/13/2025. Clerk of Court to send Petitioner one blank copy of the IFP application form for inmates along with instructions. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 4/25/2025. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Inmate with Instructions
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Habeas only - FORM Wed 04/23 10:59 AM
NOTICE from USDC advising case against William Ruebart, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:25-cv-00708-ART-DJA . ( For Distribution by law library. ) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Wed 04/23 10:57 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus