California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-03562
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:04 PM PDT
Defendant
Raghunath Battula
Defendant
Yu Logistics LLC
Plaintiff
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Al Roundtree
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/28 8:36 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Raghunath Battula, Yu Logistics LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 04/23 6:24 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 04/23 6:24 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 04/23 6:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Exhibit (non-trial) Wed 04/23 3:00 PM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. In Support of Complaint as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . (Roundtree, Al)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/22 3:40 PM
Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Interpleader Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Well Fargo & Co.. (Roundtree, Al)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 04/22 3:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Interpleader Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Roundtree, Al)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Request for Battula
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 04/22 3:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Roundtree, Al)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/22 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39558675 - Fee: $405, filed by Interpleader Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Al Roundtree added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:pla))(Roundtree, Al)
Related: [-]