California Eastern District Court
Judge:Christopher D Baker
Case #: 1:25-cv-00464
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 5:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Ally Financial, Inc.
Defendant
Lightning Recovery, Inc.
Defendant
Secure Collateral Management, LLC
Plaintiff
Kent Johnson
Represented By
Yitzchak Zelman
Marcus & Zelman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/30 1:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 04/30/2025: On April 29, 2025, Plaintiff Kent Johnson filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of the action without prejudice. (Doc.5 ). In light of the dismissal, this action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. (Deputy Clerk CRB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/29 11:50 AM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Kent Johnson. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Tue 04/22 2:36 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2025 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield (CDB) before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A(m),
Att: 2 CDB Worksheet,
Att: 3 Consent Form,
Att: 4 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Tue 04/22 2:34 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ally Financial, Inc., Lightning Recovery, Inc., Secure Collateral Management, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Yitzchak Zelman* *701 Cookman Ave.* *Asbury Park, NJ 07712*. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Ally Financial, Inc., Lightning Recovery, Inc., Secure Collateral Management, LLC by Kent Johnson. Attorney Zelman, Yitzchak added. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
1 1 utility Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/22 11:35 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Kent Johnson. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
utility Civil Case Filing Fee Tue 04/22 11:34 AM
PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12174544. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]