California Central District Court
Case #: 2:25-cv-03564
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:0001 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 6:04 PM PDT
Plaintiff
Mack's Junk Removal, LLC


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 utility Terminate Attorney Civil Case Opening - optional html form Mon 04/28 9:38 AM
In response to the opening of this case, the Clerk issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Attorney Case Opening. The Notice indicated that unless counsel corrected the identified discrepancy within two business days, the docket for this case number would be closed and no further filings would be permitted under this case number. Counsel has not corrected the discrepancy. Accordingly, this case is now closed. No further filings may be made under this case number, except, if applicable, to request a refund of fees using a Form G-124, Application for Refund of Fees. Should you wish to pursue this action, a new case must be filed and a new case number issued. (Case Terminated.) (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1 1 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Thu 04/24 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (ghap)
Related: [-]