California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:25-cv-03565
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:0001 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 6:04 PM PDT
Defendant
EquipmentShare.com Inc.
Defendant
H&E Equipment Services, Inc.
Defendant
Herc Holdings Inc.
Defendant
Herc Rentals Inc.
Defendant
RB Global, Inc.
Defendant
Rouse Services LLC
Defendant
Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Defendant
Sunset Equipment Co., LLC
Defendant
The Home Depot, Inc.
Defendant
United Rentals, Inc.
Plaintiff
Mack's Junk Removal, LLC
Represented By
Michael J Flannery
Cuneo Gilbert & Laduca, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 cs_rasgn Reassign Case upon Recusal of Magistrate Judge (CV-110) Mon 04/28 2:11 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment for Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-03565-MRA (SKx). (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 04/24 9:17 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis J Flynn, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Mack's Junk Removal, LLC. Adding Francis J. Flynn, Jr. as counsel of record for Mack's Junk Removal, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mack's Junk Removal, LLC. (Attorney Francis J Flynn, Jr added to party Mack's Junk Removal, LLC(pty:pla))(Flynn, Francis)
Related: [-]
10 10 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 04/24 7:54 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cody McCracken. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
Related: [-]
9 9 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 04/24 7:53 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel M Cohen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 04/24 7:52 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Evelyn Riley. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 04/24 7:51 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Marco Cercone. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 04/24 7:43 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 04/24 7:43 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/24 7:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/22 6:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mack's Junk Removal, LLC, identifying no corporate parents or affiliates. (Flannery, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 04/22 5:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mack's Junk Removal, LLC. (Flannery, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 67 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/22 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39560703 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Mack's Junk Removal, LLC. (Attorney Michael J Flannery added to party Mack's Junk Removal, LLC(pty:pla))(Flannery, Michael)
Related: [-]