California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:25-cv-03566
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 6:04 PM PDT
Defendant
Pamela J. Bondi
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530
Defendant
Ted H. Kim
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services 20 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 6030
Washington, DC 20259
Defendant
Loren K. Miller
USCIS Nebraska Service Center 850 S. Street
Lincoln, NE 68508
Defendant
Secretary KRISTI NOEM
U.S. Department of Homeland Security 245 Murray Lane, SW Mail Stop 0485
Washington, DC 20528
Defendant
Director David Radel
Los Angeles Asylum Office 14101 Myford Road
Tustin, CA 92780
Defendant
Kika Scott
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services 2707 Martin Luther King Jr. Avenue, SE
Washington, DC 20528
Plaintiff
Moli Luo
Represented By
Lanlan Wang
Haven And King Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Zhiqiang Xiu
Represented By
Lanlan Wang
Haven And King Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Ziming Xiu
Represented By
Lanlan Wang
Haven And King Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 04/28 1:41 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 04/24 9:17 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Pamela J. Bondi, Ted H. Kim, Loren K. Miller, Kristi Noem, David Radel, Kika Scott. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 04/24 9:15 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 04/24 9:14 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/24 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/22 7:00 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney Moli Luo, Zhiqiang Xiu, Ziming Xiu, (Wang, Lanlan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 04/22 6:58 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lanlan Wang counsel for Plaintiffs Moli Luo, Zhiqiang Xiu, Ziming Xiu. Adding Lanlan Wang a.k.a. Jenny Wang as counsel of record for Moli Luo, Zhiqiang Xiu, Ziming Xiu for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney Lanlan Wang a.k.a. Jenny Wang. (Wang, Lanlan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 04/22 6:33 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Attorney Moli Luo, Zhiqiang Xiu, Ziming Xiu. (Wang, Lanlan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 04/22 6:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Moli Luo, Zhiqiang Xiu, Ziming Xiu. (Wang, Lanlan)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/22 5:54 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39560732 - Fee: $405, filed by Attorney Ziming Xiu, Zhiqiang Xiu, Moli Luo. (Attorney Lanlan Wang added to party Moli Luo(pty:pla), Attorney Lanlan Wang added to party Zhiqiang Xiu(pty:pla), Attorney Lanlan Wang added to party Ziming Xiu(pty:pla))(Wang, Lanlan)
Related: [-]