South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elisabetta Gm Gasparini
Case #: 2:25-bk-01506
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Country Living, LLC
4403 Highway 17 S
North Myrtle Beach, SC 29582-5254
Represented By
Benjamin R. Matthews
Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 12:02 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
19 19 court Hearing (Document) Sched Tue 04/29 10:16 AM
Hearing scheduled relating to: Application to Employ Benjamin R. Matthews NUNC PRO TUNC Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews on behalf of Country Living, LLC. Document Served . Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at Charleston. The case judge is Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini. (Tull, C)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, April 28, 2025
18 18 misc Affidavit of Counsel Mon 04/28 4:05 PM
Affidavit of Counsel in re: Application to Employ filed by Debtor Country Living, LLC Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. Related [+]. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 9
17 17 misc Withdrawal of Document Mon 04/28 4:03 PM
Withdrawal of Affidavit of Counsel Reason for Withdrawal: Unexecuted copy of affidavit filed in error. Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. Related [+]. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 answer Objection Mon 04/28 3:37 PM
Objection to Application to Employ filed by Debtor Country Living, LLC, Affidavit of Counsel filed by Debtor Country Living, LLC with Certificate of Service Filed by US Trustee's Office Related [+]. (Poston, Brandon)
Related: [-] 9 ,15
15 15 misc Affidavit of Counsel Mon 04/28 2:01 PM
Affidavit of Counsel in re: Application to Employ filed by Debtor Country Living, LLC Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. Related [+]. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 9
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/28 9:16 AM
Certificate of Service RE: Amended Voluntary Petition filed by Debtor Country Living, LLC. Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. Related [+]. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 11
Saturday, April 26, 2025
13 13 court Certificate of Service BNC Document Sun 04/27 12:20 AM
Certificate of Service of Document as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/26/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, April 25, 2025
12 12 court Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors Sat 04/26 12:22 AM
Certificate of Service of Meeting of Creditors Notice as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 04/25/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
11 11 misc Amended Voluntary Petition Fri 04/25 8:56 AM
Amended Voluntary Petition Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. Related [+]. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 1
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 8:36 AM
Certificate of Service RE: Schedules/Statements Filed filed by Debtor Country Living, LLC. Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. Related [+]. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, April 24, 2025
9 9 motion Employ (Application) Thu 04/24 4:35 PM
Application to Employ Benjamin R. Matthews of Matthews and Associates as Attorney NUNC PRO TUNC Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 order Status Conference (Subchapter V) Thu 04/24 11:34 AM
Order Setting Status Conference and Deadlines relating to: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) filed by Debtor Country Living, LLC. Document Served. Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at Charleston. The case judge is Elisabetta G.M. Gasparini. Pre-Status Report due by 5/15/2025. (Barnello, P)
Related: [-] 1
7 7 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Thu 04/24 11:29 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Filed Thu 04/24 11:24 AM
Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition for a Non-Individual Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/23 11:52 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors. Document Served. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/28/2025 at 09:00 AM at Telephone - 341. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/28/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/1/2025. (Barnello, P)
Related: [-]
4 4 trustee U.S. Trustees Statement - No Creditors Committee Wed 04/23 11:38 AM
U.S. Trustee's Statement that No Creditors Committee has been appointed. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Trustee Linda)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Subchapter V) Wed 04/23 6:50 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Subchapter V) Filed by US Trustee's Office Related [+].(Barr, Trustee Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Regarding Disinterestedness and Proposed Compensation
trustee Appointment of Trustee Wed 04/23 6:46 AM
Appointment of Trustee: Christine Brimm added to the case. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Barr, Trustee Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 misc Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing Tue 04/22 12:24 PM
Debtor's Request to Activate Electronic Noticing. DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS AND THE TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE. Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty) Tue 04/22 12:23 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Non-Individual Filed by Benjamin R. Matthews of Benjamin R. Matthews & Associates on behalf of Country Living, LLC. (Matthews, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet Tue 04/22 12:26 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (atty)([LINK 25-01506 ) [misc,volp11ac] (1738.00). Receipt Number A14345190, amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]