Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Laurie J Michelson
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:25-cv-11135
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Fri 04/25 4:22 PM
ORDER Requiring Response to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Michigan Attorney General and the Michigan Department of Corrections. Response due by 10/24/2025 Reply due by 12/8/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MCho)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition of Habeas Corpus
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 04/25 4:14 PM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MCho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Wed 04/23 9:30 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Tue 04/22 11:47 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Gordon Davis. (MSyl)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 04/22 11:44 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gordon Davis against Gary Miniard. (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet