Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc. v. eBay Inc.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory B Williams |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00483 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:1 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 9:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
eBay Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, May 19, 2025 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 05/19 7:46 AM
SO ORDERED, re12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua L. Raskin, Brian Prew, Kathryn E. Albanese and Iveth Villatoro filed by eBay Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/19/2025. (lnb) |
||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Mon 05/19 11:27 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Iveth Villatoro, Kathryn E. Albanese, Brian J. Prew, Joshua L. Raskin for eBay Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd) |
||
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
misc
-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment
Fri 05/16 2:34 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Joshua L. Raskin, Brian Prew, Kathryn E. Albanese, and Iveth Villatoro. ( re12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua L. Raskin, Brian Prew, Kathryn E. Albanese and Iveth Villatoro )( Payment of $ 200, receipt number ADEDC-4689019).(Schladweiler, Benjamin) |
|
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua L. Raskin, Brian Prew, Kathryn E. Albanese and Iveth Villatoro - filed by eBay Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Thu 05/08 8:46 AM
SO ORDERED, re11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Ebay Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to June 12, 2025 filed by eBay Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/8/2025. (lnb) |
||
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Ebay Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to June 12, 2025 - filed by eBay Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Thu 04/24 8:05 AM
SO ORDERED, re9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle E. Dawson and Attorney Devan V. Padmanabhan filed by Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/24/2025. (lnb) |
||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Thu 04/24 2:37 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Devan V. Padmanabhan, Michelle E. Dawson for Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd) |
||
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
misc
-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment
Wed 04/23 2:51 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Michelle E. Dawson and Devan V. Padmanabhan. ( re9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle E. Dawson and Attorney Devan V. Padmanabhan )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4668632).(Dorsney, Kenneth) |
|
9 | 9
![]() MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle E. Dawson and Attorney Devan V. Padmanabhan - filed by Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/23 8:15 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb) |
||
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Multi Media Document
Wed 04/23 9:40 AM
MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc. in the form of a Thumb Drive containing Exhibit A to Complaint (D.I.1 ). Filing related to7 Notice of Filing Multimedia Material. (*Media on file in Clerk's Office). (nms) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Video Exhibit A to the Complaint. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Kenneth Laurence Dorsney on behalf of Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc. (Dorsney, Kenneth) |
|
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc..eBay Inc. served on 4/22/2025, answer due 5/13/2025. (Dorsney, Kenneth) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to eBay Inc. on 4/22/2025. (jfm) |
|
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Virtual Coast Associates, Inc. for Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc. - filed by Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc. (jfm) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,171,629; 7,428,707. (jfm) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against eBay Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4666447) - filed by Adaptive Avenue Associates, Inc.(jfm) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |