Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 4:25-cv-00099
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Sedgwick Claims Management
Defendant
Sunrise Senior Living of Decatur
Plaintiff
Amelina Archelus
P.O.Box 5163
Rome, GA 30162


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Tue 04/29 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Filing Evidence re3 Complaint, by Amelina Archelus. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 11:12 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Amelina Archelus.(klb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 2 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/25 11:09 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at this time. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this case to the District Court for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28. U.S.C. § 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 4/25/25. c:Financial Office(klb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/25 11:13 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Amelina Archelus re2 Order. (klb)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 04/25 11:14 PM
Submission of3 Complaint, for a frivolity determination, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 3:42 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amelina Archelus.(tmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Sunrise,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/22 3:43 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (tmf)
Related: [-]