Massachusetts District Court
Judge:George A Otoole, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-11057
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause11:101 Bankruptcy
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:10 AM EDT
Appellant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Marcus E. Pratt
Korde & Associates PC
contact info
Appellee
Kyra Isabel Nelson
65 Lovers Lane
Groton, MA 01450
In Re
Kyra Isabel Nelson
65 Lovers Lane
Groton, MA 01450


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Fialkow on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Fialkow, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. McCarthy on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (McCarthy, Keith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 04/22 1:00 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. (JKK)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 appeal Bankruptcy Docket Received Tue 04/22 12:19 PM
Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received from USBC:1 Bankruptcy Appeal (SP)
Related: [-]
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Tue 04/22 12:18 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 24-41202 File received (SP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initial Transmittal