New York Northern District Court
Judge:Brenda K Sannes
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 5:25-cv-00490
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Charlene Eaton
Plaintiff
Michel Manassa
Represented By
Eric J. Pons
Chase Law & Associates, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
notice Notice - Other Wed 04/23 10:35 AM
TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference, set for 7/23/2025 at 2:30PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a Teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Tue 04/22 2:28 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/23/2025 at 2:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/16/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 2:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Charlene Eaton. (egr)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Charlene Eaton (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7105058) filed by Michel Manassa.(egr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet