Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Case #: 3:25-cv-01227
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:11 AM AST
Defendant
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Defendant
Department of Education of Puerto Rico
Plaintiff
Belizabeth Velazquez Mercado
Represented By
Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Velez Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM AST
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 04/23 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 32 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 8:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Belizabeth Velazquez Mercado. Service due by 7/21/2025,(Velez-Colon, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
2 2 motion Restrict Tue 04/22 8:03 PM
MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Belizabeth Velazquez Mercado. Responses due by 5/6/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Velez-Colon, Jose)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 8:00 PM
***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Belizabeth Velazquez Mercado. Responses due by 5/6/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Velez-Colon, Jose)
Related: [-]