South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-02224
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 6:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
Mine Respirator Company LLC
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Royal Chemical Company LTD
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
UTC Fire & Securities Americas
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corp Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Plaintiff
Lynn Wakefield
Represented By
James L Ferraro, Jr
The Ferraro Law Firm PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 04/22 11:15 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 3/20/2025), Lynn Wakefield v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02224-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western District of Texas (jbin)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 11:14 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
1 1 55 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12340508.), filed by Lynn Wakefield. Service due by 6/18/2025 (jbin)
Related: [-]