Kelly R. Murphy v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02407 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 5:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Coporation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairway Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Ciba, Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133 |
|
Plaintiff
Kelly R. Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 04/22 4:53 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 3/21/2025), Kelly R. Murphy v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02407-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern District of Ohio (jbin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin) |
|
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12343633.), filed by Kelly R. Murphy. Service due by 6/20/2025 (jbin) |