South Carolina District Court
Judge:Jacquelyn D Austin
Case #: 8:25-cv-03367
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Case in other court:Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas, 2025CP2400223
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:24 AM EDT
Defendant
D.R. Horton Inc
Represented By
John T Crawford, Jr
Kenison Dudley Crawford
contact info
Plaintiff
Bob Wood
Represented By
Jon E Newlon
Mccravy Newton And Sturkie Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Gail Wood
Represented By
Jon E Newlon
Mccravy Newton And Sturkie Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 2:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Theron H. Knight, III. (alma, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 motion Stay Tue 04/29 6:09 PM
MOTION to Stay re12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay by D.R. Horton Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bible, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Compel Tue 04/29 6:06 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay by D.R. Horton Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Bible, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support Defendant DR Horton's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/29 9:36 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/20/2025, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/3/2025, Rule 26 Report due by 6/3/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/24/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/24/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/25/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/25/2025, Discovery due by 10/24/2025, ADR Statement due by 10/24/2025, Mediation Due by 11/24/2025, Rule 56 Conference Deadline 12/2/2025, Motions due by 12/23/2025, and Jury Selection Deadline 2/23/2026. Signed by Honorable Jacquelyn D Austin on 4/29/25. (alma, ) Modified on 4/29/2025 to edit docket text (alma, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 17 pgs cmp Third Party Complaint Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal Mon 04/28 1:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Theron H. Knight, III by D.R. Horton Inc.(Crawford, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Subcontractor ICA
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Bible, Jr on behalf of D.R. Horton Inc (Bible, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 04/24 1:08 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bob Wood, Gail Wood.(Newlon, Jon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 notice Notice Other Tue 04/22 1:28 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories (including section H) are due fourteen (14) days after removal. (alma, ) Modified on 4/22/2025 to correct document number (alma, ).
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 service Certificate of Service Tue 04/22 1:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by D.R. Horton Inc re1 Notice of Removal. (alma, ) Modified on 4/22/2025 to correct document number (alma, ).
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 04/22 1:27 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by D.R. Horton Inc. (alma, )
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Tue 04/22 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2025CP2400223. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12404406), filed by D.R. Horton Inc. (alma, ) (Certificate removed and refiled as an individual entry on 4/22/2025) (alma, ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of State Court Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Summons & Complaint