Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:25-cv-00676
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Attorney General of the U.S.
Defendant
Bridget Bean
Defendant
Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Defendant
U.S. Attorney for E.D.V.A
Defendant
US Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff
Ronald Douglas Lafond
1625 Sound Watch Drive
Wilmington, NC 28409


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing Fri 04/25 12:15 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 4/25/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 motion Pro Se E-Noticing Tue 04/22 4:14 PM
MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Ronald Douglas Lafond. (swil)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 04/22 4:12 PM
Summons Issued to be served by certfied mail as to Attorney General of the U.S., Bridget Bean, Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, Kristi Noem, U.S. Attorney for E.D.V.A, US Department of Homeland Security(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Notice
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Attorney General of the U.S., Bridget Bean, Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, Kristi Noem, U.S. Attorney for E.D.V.A, US Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 100011495.), filed by Ronald Douglas Lafond.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Receipt