Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Everett
Case #: 7:25-bk-70114
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 20, 2025

Debtor
940 Roofing & Construction, LLC
4400 Sand Rd
Vernon, TX 76384-7649
Represented By
Monte J. White
Monte J. White & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Anne Elizabeth Burns
900 Jackson Street, Suite 570
Dallas, TX 75202
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 04/23/2025 12:06 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
crditcrd none Tue 04/22 3:27 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload)([LINK 25-70114 7] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00). Receipt number A32445560, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (case upload) Tue 04/22 1:54 PM
Non-Individual Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload) filed by Monte J. White on behalf of 940 Roofing & Construction, LLC. (White, Monte)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Tue 04/22 1:58 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Burns, Anne Elizabeth with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 01:00 PM via Zoom - Burns: Meeting ID 603 410 0887, Passcode 5831589282, Phone 1-469-218-9155. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is future date. (White, Monte)
Related: [-]