California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 3:25-bk-30315
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 15, 2025

Debtor
StartUp SmartUp
2380 California St Apt 402
San Francisco, CA 94115-2740
Represented By
Miles Archer Woodlief
Law Offices Of Miles Archer Woodlief
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Michael G. Kasolas
P.O. Box 27526
San Francisco, CA 94127
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 04/23/2025 12:01 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
crditcrd none Tue 04/22 8:05 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-30315 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A33818558, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/22 7:53 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $338. Filed by StartUp SmartUp. Incomplete Filings due by 05/6/2025. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 05/6/2025. (Woodlief, Miles)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Creditor Matrix Tue 04/22 7:57 PM
Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor StartUp SmartUp (Woodlief, Miles)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Tue 04/22 8:00 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 2500 Filed by Debtor StartUp SmartUp (Woodlief, Miles)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Tue 04/22 8:03 PM
Declaration Filed by Debtor StartUp SmartUp (Woodlief, Miles)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Tue 04/22 11:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Interim Trustee Michael Kasolas with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/15/2025 at 01:00 PM via Zoom Trustee - Kasolas: Meeting ID 507 088 8381, Passcode 8618882211, Phone 1-510-671-5187. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment)
Related: [-]