California Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey S White
Case #: 4:25-cv-03244
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Moises Becerra
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Todd M. Lyons
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
H.G.
Represented By
Zachary Nightingale
Van Der Hout LLP
contact info
Marc Van Der Hout
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info
John Nicholas Sinodis
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
S.Y.
Represented By
Zachary Nightingale
Van Der Hout LLP
contact info
Marc Van Der Hout
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info
John Nicholas Sinodis
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
W.X.
Represented By
Zachary Nightingale
Van Der Hout LLP
contact info
Marc Van Der Hout
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info
John Nicholas Sinodis
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Y.W.
Represented By
Zachary Nightingale
Van Der Hout LLP
contact info
Marc Van Der Hout
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info
John Nicholas Sinodis
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Z.D.
Represented By
Zachary Nightingale
Van Der Hout LLP
contact info
Marc Van Der Hout
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info
John Nicholas Sinodis
Van Der Hout, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
45 45 misc Proposed Order Mon 05/12 5:54 PM
Proposed Order Updated Proposed Order for Motion for Preliminary Injunction by S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X.. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
44 44 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 05/12 4:42 PM
REPLY Related [+] in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byS.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X..(Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-] 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order
Att: 1 Declaration
Friday, May 09, 2025
43 43 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 05/09 4:57 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byKristi Noem, Todd M. Lyons, Moises Becerra, Donald J. Trump.(Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order
Att: 1 Declaration Watson Decl.,
Att: 2 Declaration Young Decl.
42 42 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/09 10:53 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DUE DATE FOR DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 60 in 4:25-cv-03140-JSW, 30 in 4:25-cv-03502-JSW. 41 in 4:25-cv-03244-JSW, STIPULATION. Opposition due by 5:00pm on 5/9/2025. Reply due by 5:00pm on 5/12/2025. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2025 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (nmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
41 41 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 05/08 6:13 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X.. (Sinodis, John)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Order Thu 05/08 5:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: The deadline for Defendants to file their opposition briefs has passed. The Court received a communication through its Courtroom Deputy that the parties inquired whether the Court would conduct the hearing on May 14, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. The Court can accommodate that request if it is necessary to give the parties additional time to resolve the matters. The parties shall either file a stipulation and request to continue OR the Government shall file its supplemental briefs by no later than 8:00 p.m. May 8, 2025 and the hearing will remain on calendar on May 13, 2025 at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 8, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jswlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 05/08 8:51 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Allow the Parties to Engage in Negotiations for a Potential Resolution; [Proposed] Order filed by Kristi Noem, Todd M. Lyons, Moises Becerra, Donald J. Trump. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
38 38 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/07 6:01 PM
ORDER TERMINATING (56 in 4:25-cv-03140-JSW) and GRANTING AS MODIFIED (57 in 4:25-cv-03140-JSW) STIPULATION (Corrected to Replace Dkt. No. 56) to Extend Time to Allow the Parties to Engage in Negotiations for a Potential Resolution. Defendants' Responses due by 5:00 P.M. 5/8/2025. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 7, 2025. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
37 37 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/06 4:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DUE DATE FOR DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting ( 34 in 4:25-cv-03475-JSW) STIPULATION,( 36 in 4:25-cv-03244-JSW) STIPULATION ( 21 in 4:25-cv-03549-JSW) STIPULATION, ( 54 in 4:25-cv-03140-JSW) STIPULATION ( 25 in 4:25-cv-03323-JSW) STIPULATION, ( 24 in 4:25-cv-03502-JSW) STIPULATION, ( 24 in 4:25-cv-03407-JSW) STIPULATION, ( 29 in 4:25-cv-03383-JSW) STIPULATION, ( 41 in 4:25-cv-03292-JSW) STIPULATION, ( 30 in 4:25-cv-03481-JSW) STIPULATION, ( 18 in 4:25-cv-03480-JSW) STIPULATION. Opposition due no later than 5:00 p.m. on 5/7/2025.(nmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 05/06 2:34 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendants' Supplemental Opposition filed by Kristi Noem, Todd M. Lyons, Moises Becerra, Donald J. Trump. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
35 35 oth_sup Supplemental Brief Wed 04/30 1:58 PM
Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Injunction filed byS.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X..(Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 8:20 AM
NOTICE by Kristi Noem, Todd M. Lyons, Moises Becerra, Donald J. Trump Regarding Policy (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
33 33 misc Statement Mon 04/28 12:53 PM
Statement Regarding Reactivation of Plaintiffs SEVIS Records by Kristi Noem, Todd M. Lyons, Moises Becerra, Donald J. Trump. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 5:56 PM
NOTICE by S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X. Regarding Plaintiffs' SEVIS Records (Sinodis, John)
Related: [-]
31 31 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/25 3:41 PM
ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULES AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Re 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/25/2025. Defendant's brief is due by 9:00 p.m., on 4/25/2025. Plaintiff's supplemental briefs is due by 2:00 p.m., on 4/30/2025. Opposition briefs is due by 2:00 p.m., on 5/6/2025. Replies due by 7:00 p.m., on 5/9/2025. (nmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
30 30 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/25 2:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey S. White: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 4/25/2025. Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/13/2025 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White.Total Time in Court: 2:08. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney: John Nicholas Sinodis and Marc Van Der Hout. Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth D. Kurlan and Pamela Johann. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (nmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2025)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
29 29 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 04/23 4:57 PM
REPLY Related [+] in Support of TRO filed byS.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X..(Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-] 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order
Att: 1 Declaration
28 28 5 pgs order Order Wed 04/23 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF QUESTIONS RE Motions for Temporary Restraining Orders (10 in 4:25-cv-03244-JSW), (7 in 4:25-cv-03292-JSW), and (9 in 4:25-cv-03140-JSW). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 23, 2025. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
27 27 oth_sup Re-notice motion Wed 04/23 3:27 PM
Renotice motion hearing re10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for 4/25/2025 at 9:00 am filed byS.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X.. Related [+] (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/22 4:33 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING RE10 . YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on April 25, 2025 at 9:00 AM, the Honorable Jeffrey S. White will conduct a Motion hearing Re 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2025 09:00 AM in Oakland, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . (nmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/22 4:14 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. District Judge Noel Wise no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/22 4:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on April 25, 2025 at 9:00 AM, the Honorable Jeffrey S. White will conduct a Status Conference. Status Conference set for 4/25/2025 09:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) , (nmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 order ~Util - Create Case Relationship Order Relating Case Tue 04/22 3:42 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE Re 9 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/22/2025. Related cases: 25-cv-03140-JSW is related to 25-cv-03244-NW. (nmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
22 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Corrected version to include TOC & attachments and replace Dkt. No.19 filed byKristi Noem, Todd M. Lyons, Moises Becerra, Donald J. Trump.(Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order
Att: 1 Declaration Watson Decl.,
Att: 2 Exhibit ICE Letter
21 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Marc Van Der Hout on behalf of S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X. (Van Der Hout, Marc)
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by John Nicholas Sinodis on behalf of S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X. (Sinodis, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byKristi Noem, Todd M. Lyons, Moises Becerra, Donald J. Trump. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/22/2025 (cv, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order
18 18 ORDER by Judge Noel Wise denying 17 Stipulation. Opposition due by 4/21/2025, no later than 5:00PM. Reply due by 4/23/2025, no later than 5:00pm. Hearing set for 9:00 a.m. on 4/25/2025. (nwlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation with Proposed Order to Reset Hearing by One Business Day and to Extend Time for Submissions by Six Hours filed by S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X.. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Elizabeth D. Kurlan on behalf of Kristi Noem, Todd M. Lyons, Moises Becerra, Donald J. Trump (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X. re13 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Affidavit of Service of the Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
14 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X. re1 Complaint,10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ,11 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,3 Certificate of Interested Entities,9 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases,6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA,7 Summons Issued as to USA (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING Signed by Judge Noel Wise on 4/17/2025. Responses due by April 21, 2025 at 11:00a.m. Reply due April 23, 2025 at 11:00a.m. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2025 at 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before District Judge Noel Wise. (akw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DEADLINE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2025 in accordance with the Court's Standing Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (akw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Using Pseudonym signed by Judge Noel Wise. (akw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X..(Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
9 9 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases: Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), S.Y., et al v. Noem, et al, 25-cv-03244-NW is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable Jeffrey S. White for consideration of whether the case is related to Doe v. Trump et al, 25-cv-03140-JSW. Signed by Judge Noel Wise on 4/16/2025. (akw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Y.W., Z.D., S.Y., H.G., W.X.. Moises Becerra served on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025; Todd M. Lyons served on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025; Kristi Noem served on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025; Donald J. Trump served on 4/11/2025, answer due 6/10/2025. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
7 7 Summons Issued as to Moises Becerra, Todd M. Lyons, Kristi Noem, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2025 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Case assigned to District Judge Noel Wise and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Discovery. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X.. Responses due by 4/15/2025.(Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by S.Y., Z.D., Y.W., H.G., W.X. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Moises Becerra, Todd M. Lyons, Kristi Noem, Donald J. Trump ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20555734.). Injunction against the US government/official or APA vacatur requested. Filed by Y.W., Z.D., S.Y., H.G., W.X..(Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration with Exhibits,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet