California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:25-cv-03500
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause28:7402 Refund of Taxes
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 8:04 PM PDT
Defendant
United States
Plaintiff
Dennis Yabuki
156 Estabrook St. Apt. 102
San Leandro, CA 94577
Represented By
Sandeep Singh
Stonebridge Counsel, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 9:39 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dennis Yabuki.. (Singh, Sandeep)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 6:04 PM
Summons Issued as to United States. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 04/22 8:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/6/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by Dennis Yabuki (Singh, Sandeep)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Singh, Sandeep)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT FOR TAX REFUND AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against United States, (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number BCANDC-20591867). Filed by Dennis Yabuki.(Singh, Sandeep) Modified on 4/22/2025 (tn, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C