Bradshaw et al v. Jewkes et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Mcshane |
Case #: | 6:25-cv-00640 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2025 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jessica Bowron
|
|
Defendant
Holly Jewkes
|
|
Defendant
Brooke Rollins
|
|
Defendant
Unnamed & Unknown Contractors Engaged By the National Parks Service for the Cabin Butte Vegetation Management Project
|
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Bradshaw
680 NW Bond Street
Bend, OR 97703 |
|
Plaintiff
Mandy Bryant
680 NW Bond Street
Bend, OR 97703 |
|
Plaintiff
Chris Daggett
680 NW Bond Street
Bend, OR 97703 |
|
Plaintiff
Eric Garrity
680 NW Bond Street
Bend, OR 97703 |
|
Plaintiff
Penny Gartner
680 NW Bond Street
Bend, OR 97703 |
|
Plaintiff
Charles Hemingway
Homeless Service Providers 680 NW Bond Street
Bend, OR 97703 |
|
Plaintiff
Homeless Individuals
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
order
1 - Scheduling
Tue 04/29 12:35 PM
Order :Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No.1 , is DENIED. Because the Cabin Butte Vegetation Management Project is slated to begin in two days, the Court wanted to alert the parties it would not be granting injunctive relief. Written Opinion to follow. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Reply to Defendant's Response . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garrity, Eric) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ORDER: Granting10 Application of Charles Hemingway for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Signed on 4/29/2025 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) |
|
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Declaration of Holly Jewkes . Filed by All Defendants. (Martin, Sean) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() Response to Request for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by All Defendants. (Martin, Sean) |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Proposed Settlement Agreement for "rolling closure" . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Garrity, Eric) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Charles Hemingway. (jw) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Appearance of Sean E. Martin appearing on behalf of All Defendants . Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Martin, Sean) |
|
8 | 8
order
1 - Scheduling
Wed 04/23 11:28 AM
Scheduling Order: Government's Response to Request for Injunction/Temporary Restraining included in Complaint1 is due by 05:00PM on 4/28/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/24/2025.) (cp) |
|
7 | 7
![]() ORDER: Granting6 Application of Eric Garrity for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/23/2025.) (cp) |
|
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Prior e-Filer Case Number 6:23-cv-01064-AA. Filed by Eric Garrity. (jw) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued Electronically as to Brooke Rollins. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (le) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued Electronically as to Jessica Bowron. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (le) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued Electronically as to Holly Jewkes. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (le) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/20/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/19/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 9/19/2025. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/22/2025.) (le) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Complaint for Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order Under FRCP Rule 65(b). Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Receipt No. 15498. Jury Trial Requested: No. Expedited Hearing Requested. Filed by Eric Garrity, Chris Daggett, Charles Hemingway, Mandy Bryant, Theresa Bradshaw, Penny Gartner, Homeless Individuals against All Defendants. (le) (le) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |