Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Stanley A Bastian
Case #: 2:25-cv-00129
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Terminated:Apr 29, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
utility Remark Wed 04/30 10:31 AM
Remark: Case transferred from Washington Eastern has been opened in United States District Court for the Western District of Washington as case 2:25-cv-00794, filed 04/29/2025. **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Scott Fischer, Prisoner ID: 960451) (JW, Management Analyst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Transferring Case Out - District Transfer Tue 04/29 2:50 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON. Case transferred to Western District of Washington. File is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SG, Case Administrator) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Scott Fischer, Prisoner ID: 960451)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 notice Notice - Other Mon 04/28 3:36 PM
Notice regarding filing fee was sent by Scott Allen Fischer. (SG, Case Administrator) **2 PAGE(S) PRINT ALL** (Scott Fischer, Prisoner ID: 960451)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
misc Payment or Deposit Received Fri 04/25 9:42 AM
Filing Fee Received. Receipt #43570 in the amount of $5 from Coyote Ridge Corrections Center on behalf of Scott Fischer. (AY, DQA) **PRINT NEF ONLY** (Scott Fischer, Prisoner ID: 960451)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 misc Letter to Prisoner from Clerk - Case Opening Tue 04/22 3:03 PM
Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (SG, Case Administrator) **PRINT ALL** (Scott Fischer, Prisoner ID: 960451)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 16 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 04/22 2:57 PM
Memorandum in Support of 2254 Petition for Relief of Conviction or Sentence by Scott Allen Fischer. (SG, Case Administrator) **16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Scott Fischer, Prisoner ID: 960451)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 04/22 2:53 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted) Filed by Scott Allen Fischer.(SG, Case Administrator) **102 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Scott Fischer, Prisoner ID: 960451)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A-D,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-11