Washington Western District Court
Judge:Marsha J Pechman
Referred: David W Christel
Case #: 2:25-cv-00721
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 04/23 3:50 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends this action be dismissed without prejudice. It is further recommended Petitioner's IFP motion (Dkt.1 ) and his other proposed motions and requests (Dkts.1 -6,1 -7,1 -8,1 -10,1 -11,1 -12,1 -14,1 -15,1 -16,1 -17,1 -18,1 -19) be denied as moot. Finally, a certificate of appealability should be denied in this case. Objections to this Report and Recommendation, if any, should be filed with the Clerk and served upon all parties to this suit not later than fourteen (14) days from the date on which this Report and Recommendation is signed. The matter will be ready for consideration by the District Judge on May 8, 2025. Singed by Judge David W. Christel. **7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Neil Roberson, Prisoner ID: 854232) (MDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 misc Letter Tue 04/22 3:54 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Neil Roberson, Prisoner ID: 854232) (MIH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/22 3:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge David W. Christel filed by Neil Roberson. **90 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Neil Roberson, Prisoner ID: 854232) (MIH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus,
Att: 2 Exhibits to Proposed 2241 Petition,
Att: 3 Memorandum in Support of 28 USC 2241,
Att: 4 Affidavit in Support of 28 USC 2241,
Att: 5 Prayer for Relief,
Att: 6 Request for Certification,
Att: 7 PROPOSED Preliminary Injunction Appeal,
Att: 8 PROPOSED Request for Injunction Pursuant to 18 USC 3143(b) in Support of Appeal,
Att: 9 Notice of Withdrawal of Consent Re Magistrate,
Att: 10 PROPOSED Motion to Waive Magistrate Judge,
Att: 11 PROPOSED Motion for Brady Order,
Att: 12 PROPOSED Motion to Unseal Record or to Compel Showing of Confidentiality,
Att: 13 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Brady Order and Unseal Records,
Att: 14 PROPOSED Motion for In Camera Review in Support of 28 USC 2241,
Att: 15 PROPOSED Motion Requesting Application of 28 USC 636,
Att: 16 PROPOSED Motion Requesting Judicial Notice,
Att: 17 PROPOSED Motion Requesting Production of the Record,
Att: 18 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Stand By Counsel,
Att: 19 PROPOSED Motion to Show Cause Pursuant to 28 USC 2243,
Att: 20 Prisoner Trust Statement