Washington Western District Court
Judge:Ricardo S Martinez
Case #: 2:25-cv-00739
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Bhawani Inc
Defendant
Taqueria El Kioska
Plaintiff
Brent Rotter
Represented By
Peter Roy Barnett
Law Office Of Peter R Barnett PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 order RSM - Joint Status Report Order (FORM) Tue 04/29 2:56 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/27/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/3/2025, Joint Status Report due by 6/10/2025. (LC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 4:45 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to all Defendants (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/23 4:40 PM
Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 7:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Related [+] filed by Brent Rotter.(Barnett, Peter)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8941810
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Business Entity Disclosure