Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:25-cv-00740
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
El Toreo Tienda Y Carnice
Defendant
Dich Lynn
Plaintiff
Brent Rotter
Represented By
Peter Roy Barnett
Law Office Of Peter R Barnett PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
3 3 misc RAJ Standing Order (FORM) Thu 04/24 7:45 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 4:57 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to all Defendants (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/23 4:51 PM
Judge Richard A. Jones added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 8:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Related [+] filed by Brent Rotter.(Barnett, Peter)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8941819
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Business Entity Disclosure