Washington Western District Court
Judge:Lauren King
Case #: 2:25-cv-00741
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Jim's Mart Gas Station
Defendant
SJN Thind Enterprise LLC
Plaintiff
Chase Tasca
Represented By
Peter Roy Barnett
Law Office Of Peter R Barnett PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 order LK Standing Order for All Civil Cases (FORM) Fri 04/25 1:00 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Standing Order
3 3 order LK Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Fri 04/25 12:59 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 5:06 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to all Defendants (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/23 5:02 PM
Judge Lauren King added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 8:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Related [+] filed by Chase Tasca.(Barnett, Peter)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8941822
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Business Entity Disclosure