Hawaii District Court
Judge:Jill A Otake
Referred: Wes Reber Porter
Case #: 1:25-cv-00164
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 minutes Link Wed 04/23 11:02 AM
EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 04/22 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 25-00164 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings (cib) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 12:48 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER re1 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/22/2025. (cib) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
Related: [-]
misc Court's Certificate of Service Tue 04/22 12:56 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of2 Order,1 Complaint has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Christopher K.Y. Chan. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
Related: [-]
misc Court's Certificate of Service Tue 04/22 3:17 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 3 Notice of Case Assignment,, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Christopher K.Y. Chan. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 12:39 PM
COMPLAINT For Severed Counts/Claims 7 thru 19 in CV 24-00378 JAO-WRP; Demand For Jury Trial; Declaration of Inmate Filing against All Defendants - filed by Christopher K.Y. Chan. (cib)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 mailing envelope