New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John P Mastando III
Case #: 1:25-bk-10794
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Dominican Bar & Restaurant Corp.
25 East 170th Street Ground Floor
Bronx, NY 10452
Represented By
Dominican Bar & Restaurant Corp.
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 3:26 PM EDT
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Greg M. Zipes
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 misc Resolution or Other Statement Authorizing Filing Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Tue 04/29 4:45 PM
Resolution or Other Statement Authorizing Filing Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Filed by Dominican Bar & Restaurant Corp.. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sat 04/26 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/24 10:20 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Greg M. Zipes on behalf of United States Trustee. (Zipes, Greg)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 6 pgs motion Motion, Convert Case 11 to 7 (fee) Wed 04/23 2:33 PM
Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7 , or in the alternative, Motion to Dismiss Case with hearing to be held May 29, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. filed by Greg M. Zipes on behalf of United States Trustee. (Zipes, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit A
2 2 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Wed 04/23 10:00 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 12:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Wed 04/23 8:09 AM
Judge John P. Mastando III added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 04/23 8:23 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: Related [+] (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-] cord of Interest in Education Individual Retirement Account Due: 5/6/2025
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 04/23 3:18 PM
Receipt of Motion to Convert Case 11 to 7([LINK 25-10794 jpm] ) [motion,146] ( 15.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 211920. Fee amount 15.00. Related [+] (Harris)
Related: [-] Doc #3
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 04/23 8:08 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Fee Amount $ 1738, Receipt Number 10001944 Schedule A/B due 5/6/2025. Schedule D due 5/6/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/6/2025. Schedule G due 5/6/2025. Schedule H due 5/6/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/6/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/6/2025. Statement of Operations DUE at Time of Filing. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors DUE at Time of Filing. Balance Sheet Due Date:5/6/2025. Cash Flow Statement DUE at Time of Filing. Declaration of Schedules due 5/6/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/6/2025. Record of Interest in Education Individual Retirement Account Due: 5/6/2025. Resolution or Other Statement Authorizing Filing Pursuant to LR 1074-1 DUE at Time of Filing. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit DUE at Time of Filing. Corporate Ownership Statement DUE at Time of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 5/6/2025, Small Business Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/20/2025, Disclosure Statement due by 10/20/2025, Filed by Dominican Bar & Restaurant Corp. . (Porter, Minnie)Modified on 4/23/2025 (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]