New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:25-bk-14179
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
MWP Property 954-958 LLC
801 East 6th Street
Plainfield, NJ 07060
Represented By
Robert C. Nisenson
Robert C. Nisenson, LLC
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:26 PM EDT
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Savanna Bierne
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 05/03 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 05/02 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
8 8 order Chapter 11 Small Business Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 3:50 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Scheduling Order. The debtor's exclusive right to file a plan expires October 20, 2025; the Plan and Disclosure Statement are due February 17, 2026. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/30/2025. Status hearing to be held on 6/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Show Cause Tue 04/29 4:28 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/29/2025. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2025 at 10:00 AM, VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark.. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs motion Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Tue 04/29 3:41 PM
Application For Retention of Professional Robert C. Nisenson, Esq. as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of MWP Property 954-958 LLC. Objections due by 5/14/2025. (Nisenson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Saturday, April 26, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/27 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 04/25 1:50 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Savanna Bierne on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bierne, Savanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
3 3 misc Amended Schedules (Fee) - Use for All Amended Schedules Thu 04/24 1:22 PM
Amended Schedule(s) : Other Schedules re:Voluntary filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of MWP Property 954-958 LLC. (Nisenson, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Thu 04/24 9:43 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/28/2025 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 7/2/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/20/2025. (rah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 04/23 9:02 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of MWP Property 954-958 LLC. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/20/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 02/17/2026. (Nisenson, Robert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Wed 04/23 1:21 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-14179 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A48065411, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1