Maine District Court
Judge:Lance E Walker
Referred: Karen Frink Wolf
Case #: 1:25-cv-00186
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 11:09 AM EDT
Defendant
CIANBRO INC
Plaintiff
ADAM SHAPIRO
Represented By
CHAD T. HANSEN
Maine Employee Rights Group
contact info
JEFFREY NEIL YOUNG
Solidarity Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to CIANBRO INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (lcb)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Filing Fee Paid Wed 04/23 10:51 AM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-3100443.), filed by ADAM SHAPIRO.(HANSEN, CHAD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/23 8:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (lcb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 8:56 AM
COMPLAINT against CIANBRO INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by ADAM SHAPIRO. (Service of Process Deadline 7/21/2025) Fee due by 4/25/2025.(lcb)
Related: [-]