Maryland District Court
Judge:Paula Xinis
Case #: 8:25-cv-01312
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 11:09 AM EDT
Defendant
METRO OFFICER BARRETO
Defendant
METRO OFFICER CASTRO
Defendant
METRO OFFICER HENDERSON
Defendant
METRO OFFICER JOHN DOE
Defendant
METRO SERGEANT RICH
Defendant
Prince Georges County Government
Defendant
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Represented By
Janice Lynn Cole
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
contact info
Plaintiff
DAMON B WILSON


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/09 12:45 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION for Discovery -Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Expedited Limited Discovery filed by Damon B. Wilson.(Parker, Kim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/07 8:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION for Discovery -Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Expedited Limited Discovery filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(Cole, Janice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Marcellas Janey, Jr on behalf of Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (Janey, Neal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss Tue 05/06 7:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss in Part Plaintiff's Complaint by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority(Cole, Janice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/06 7:44 PM
NOTICE by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority of Statement Regarding Removal (Cole, Janice)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 motion Discovery Wed 04/23 4:43 PM
MOTION for Discovery -Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Expedited Limited Discovery by Damon B. Wilson(Parker, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Interrogatory,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Kim Parker, Esq.
5 5 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Wed 04/23 1:13 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 1:11 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Barreto, Castro, John Doe, Henderson, Prince Georges County Government, Rich, Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, filed by Damon B. Wilson.(bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kim D Parker, Esq on behalf of DAMON B WILSON (Parker, Kim)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 04/23 10:13 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (Cole, Janice)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/23 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court for Prince Georges County, case number C-16-CV-24-005667. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11927381), filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(Cole, Janice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet USDC,
Att: 2 Exhibit Writ of Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint
utility Remark - State Court Docs Wed 04/23 1:12 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]