Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cv-01840
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 12:08 PM CDT
Defendant
Jimmy R. Stallworth
Plaintiff
Erik Garcia
Represented By
Douglas Steven Schapiro
Schapiro Law Group Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/23/2025 12:20 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
1 1 14 pgs COMPLAINT against Jimmy R. Stallworth (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-33295389) filed by Erik Garcia. (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt - February 19, 2025,
Att: 2 Exhibit Receipt - March 4, 2025,
Att: 3 Exhibit Selfie - March 4, 2025,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jimmy R. Stallworth, filed. (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Erik Garcia, filed. (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Unavailability by Erik Garcia, filed. (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]