Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-13359

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:25-ap-01177
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
Strawberry Square, 11th Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17128
Represented By
Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Goldberg
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP 780 Third Avenue, 34th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 04/24 2:01 PM
Summons Issued to Michael Goldberg for Service on Pennsylvania Department of Revenue Answer due on 5/27/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/26/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachments
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/22 8:30 PM
Adversary case 25-01177 Complaint by Michael Goldberg against Pennsylvania Department of Revenue. Fee Amount $ 350.. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]