Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10595

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Philip Bentley
Case #: 1:25-ap-01092
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
PNMAC MORTGAGE CO., LLC
3043 Townsgate Road Suite 340
West Lake Village, CA 91361
Represented By
PNMAC MORTGAGE CO., LLC
contact info
Defendant
FAY SERVICING LLC, as servicer for Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2014-2
Represented By
FAY SERVICING LLC, as servicer for Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for MFRA Trust 2014-2
contact info
Defendant
Ameritrust Mortgage Bankers Inc.
1981 Marcus Avenue Suite C129
Lake Success, NY 11042
Represented By
Ameritrust Mortgage Bankers Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Carlos E. Parra
70 E. 162nd Street Apartment 5G
Bronx, NY 10452
Represented By
Carlos E. Parra
contact info
Plaintiff
Carol Knight
1337 Teller Avenue
Bronx, NY 10456
Represented By
H. Bruce Bronson, Jr.
Bronson Law Offices, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Wed 04/23 9:18 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB), Answer due by 5/23/2025, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 04/22 6:27 PM
Adversary case 25-01092 Complaint against PNMAC MORTGAGE CO., LLC, FAY SERVICING LLC, as servicer for WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2014-2, Ameritrust Mortgage Bankers Inc., Carlos E. Parra (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Filed by H. Bruce Bronson Jr. on behalf of Carol Knight. (Bronson, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits