Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:25-bk-22349

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:25-ap-07008
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Department of Education
Represented By
United States Department of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Del Carmen Leiva
415 Warburton Avenue Apt SB
Hastings-On-Hudson, NY 10706
Represented By
Maria Del Carmen Leiva
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 04/22 4:34 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL), Answer due by 5/22/2025, (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 04/22 4:32 PM
Adversary case 25-07008 Complaint against United States Department of Education (Fee Amount $ 350.) Related [+]. Nature(s) of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) Filed by Maria Del Carmen Leiva. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-] ceipt Number 623.