California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:25-cv-03549
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 10:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Todd M. Lyons
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Apoorv Pandkar
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saketh Paruchuri
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bhavin Patel
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bhavya Alpeshkumar Patel
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Praveen Pilyanam
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pavan Kalyan Reddy Mettupalli
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sai Venkata Rithik Antham
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Abiodun Oseni
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arindam Roy
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aryan Shah
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gm Shashi
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aravind Thirunavukkarasu
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Minchuan Wu
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mengqun Yu
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Zhaohua Zhang
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Chang Joon Ahn
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mahan Naseri
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Santosh Kumar Bammidi
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ukjin Choi
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Armaan Chowdhry
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Suman Gugulothu
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Huanyang He
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarthak Sanjay Kore
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nengke Lin
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tabrez Khan Mohammad
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Onkar Ashok Mohite
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Pablo Lopez Ordonez
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Soumitra Palit
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Jose Arias Saavedra
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arshroop Saini
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Anil Kumar Sharma
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vomsreemanasa Jalli Venkataramana
Represented By
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarath Boddu
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Judith Ihuoma Ewuzie
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aywan Das
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nitish Reddy Dakuri
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rahul Cherukuri
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yizhou Chen
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikhil Chowdary Bonthu
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sona Nikitha Bollavaram
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharvani Bolla
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Srinivasa Sai Anudeep Gadi
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebika Basnet
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vikas Reddy Amaravathi
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Majid Alfifi
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ekundayo Alabi
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdlrahman Alabdallah
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dorcas Ofori Aidoo
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ojasvi Agrawal
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Adesola Adeyemi
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shireesh Kumar Gadidesi
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Suresh Babu Gadiparthi
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rezvan Golmoradizadeh
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Farrel Gomargana
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pavan Kumar Jaliparthy
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tajrian Kamal
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ramya Krishna Kamatham
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ritesh Karnam
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shahbaz Khan
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seung Jin Kim
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Naga Swaroop Kota
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ping-Jui Liao
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Juily Mahore
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Natalia Josefina Martinez Urmeneta
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Anup Mishra
Represented By
Steven A. Brown
Reddy Neumann Brown PC
contact info
Bernard Pavel Wolfsdorf
Wolfsdorf Rosenthal LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 2:21 PM
APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Steven Brown. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 1:33 PM
REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP by Judge Jon S. Tigar re 15 Notice. Responses due by 4/30/2025. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Relating Case by Bhavya Alpeshkumar Patel, Minchuan Wu, Ping-Jui Liao, Sai Venkata Rithik Antham, Shireesh Kumar Gadidesi, Juily Mahore, Tabrez Khan Mohammad, Armaan Chowdhry, Ukjin Choi, Nengke Lin, Dorcas Ofori Aidoo, Anil Kumar Sharma, Suman Gugulothu, Chang Joon Ahn, Onkar Ashok Mohite, Vomsreemanasa Jalli Venkataramana, Gm Shashi, Juan Pablo Lopez Ordonez, Sarthak Sanjay Kore, Santosh Kumar Bammidi, Huanyang He, Soumitra Palit, Sona Nikitha Bollavaram, Aryan Shah, Maria Jose Arias Saavedra, Arshroop Saini, Sarath Boddu, Adesola Adeyemi, Praveen Pilyanam, Zhaohua Zhang, Abiodun Oseni, Abdlrahman Alabdallah, Naga Swaroop Kota, Aywan Das, Anup Mishra, Rebika Basnet, Ramya Krishna Kamatham, Tajrian Kamal, Saketh Paruchuri, Apoorv Pandkar, Ekundayo Alabi, Nitish Reddy Dakuri, Judith Ihuoma Ewuzie, Natalia Josefina Martinez Urmeneta, Sharvani Bolla, Vikas Reddy Amaravathi, Bhavin Patel, Arindam Roy, Ritesh Karnam, Suresh Babu Gadiparthi, Yizhou Chen, Nikhil Chowdary Bonthu, Ojasvi Agrawal, Pavan Kalyan Reddy Mettupalli, Pavan Kumar Jaliparthy, Shahbaz Khan, Srinivasa Sai Anudeep Gadi, Majid Alfifi, Aravind Thirunavukkarasu, Rahul Cherukuri, Rezvan Golmoradizadeh, Farrel Gomargana, Mengqun Yu (Wolfsdorf, Bernard) Modified on 4/28/2025 (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 04/28 11:51 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bhavya Alpeshkumar Patel, Minchuan Wu, Ping-Jui Liao, Sai Venkata Rithik Antham, Shireesh Kumar Gadidesi, Juily Mahore, Tabrez Khan Mohammad, Armaan Chowdhry, Ukjin Choi, Nengke Lin, Dorcas Ofori Aidoo, Anil Kumar Sharma, Suman Gugulothu, Chang Joon Ahn, Onkar Ashok Mohite, Vomsreemanasa Jalli Venkataramana, Gm Shashi, Juan Pablo Lopez Ordonez, Sarthak Sanjay Kore, Santosh Kumar Bammidi, Huanyang He, Soumitra Palit, Sona Nikitha Bollavaram, Aryan Shah, Maria Jose Arias Saavedra, Arshroop Saini, Sarath Boddu, Adesola Adeyemi, Praveen Pilyanam, Zhaohua Zhang, Abiodun Oseni, Abdlrahman Alabdallah, Naga Swaroop Kota, Aywan Das, Anup Mishra, Rebika Basnet, Ramya Krishna Kamatham, Tajrian Kamal, Saketh Paruchuri, Apoorv Pandkar, Ekundayo Alabi, Nitish Reddy Dakuri, Judith Ihuoma Ewuzie, Natalia Josefina Martinez Urmeneta, Sharvani Bolla, Vikas Reddy Amaravathi, Bhavin Patel, Arindam Roy, Ritesh Karnam, Suresh Babu Gadiparthi, Yizhou Chen, Nikhil Chowdary Bonthu, Ojasvi Agrawal, Pavan Kalyan Reddy Mettupalli, Pavan Kumar Jaliparthy, Shahbaz Khan, Srinivasa Sai Anudeep Gadi, Majid Alfifi, Aravind Thirunavukkarasu, Rahul Cherukuri, Rezvan Golmoradizadeh, Farrel Gomargana, Mengqun Yu. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2025 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 5/6/2025. Replies due by 5/13/2025.(Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Reply Appendix,
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Declarations
13 13 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 04/28 10:39 AM
Erroneous entry, wrong attachment. Refer to docket no. 14 for correction. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bhavya Alpeshkumar Patel, Minchuan Wu, Ping-Jui Liao, Sai Venkata Rithik Antham, Shireesh Kumar Gadidesi, Juily Mahore, Tabrez Khan Mohammad, Armaan Chowdhry, Ukjin Choi, Nengke Lin, Dorcas Ofori Aidoo, Anil Kumar Sharma, Suman Gugulothu, Chang Joon Ahn, Onkar Ashok Mohite, Vomsreemanasa Jalli Venkataramana, Gm Shashi, Juan Pablo Lopez Ordonez, Sarthak Sanjay Kore, Santosh Kumar Bammidi, Huanyang He, Soumitra Palit, Sona Nikitha Bollavaram, Aryan Shah, Maria Jose Arias Saavedra, Arshroop Saini, Sarath Boddu, Adesola Adeyemi, Praveen Pilyanam, Zhaohua Zhang, Abiodun Oseni, Abdlrahman Alabdallah, Naga Swaroop Kota, Aywan Das, Anup Mishra, Rebika Basnet, Ramya Krishna Kamatham, Tajrian Kamal, Saketh Paruchuri, Apoorv Pandkar, Ekundayo Alabi, Nitish Reddy Dakuri, Judith Ihuoma Ewuzie, Natalia Josefina Martinez Urmeneta, Sharvani Bolla, Vikas Reddy Amaravathi, Bhavin Patel, Arindam Roy, Ritesh Karnam, Suresh Babu Gadiparthi, Yizhou Chen, Nikhil Chowdary Bonthu, Ojasvi Agrawal, Pavan Kalyan Reddy Mettupalli, Pavan Kumar Jaliparthy, Shahbaz Khan, Srinivasa Sai Anudeep Gadi, Majid Alfifi, Aravind Thirunavukkarasu, Rahul Cherukuri, Rezvan Golmoradizadeh, Farrel Gomargana, Mengqun Yu. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2025 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 5/6/2025. Replies due by 5/13/2025. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard) Modified on 4/28/2025 (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Declarations,
Att: 2 Appendix Reply Appendix
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 04/28 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Elizabeth D. Kurlan on behalf of Todd M. Lyons (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/28 8:49 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Todd M. Lyons, Tabrez Khan Mohammad, Armaan Chowdhry, Ukjin Choi, Nengke Lin, Anil Kumar Sharma, Suman Gugulothu, Chang Joon Ahn, Onkar Ashok Mohite, Vomsreemanasa Jalli Venkataramana, Juan Pablo Lopez Ordonez, Sarthak Sanjay Kore, Santosh Kumar Bammidi, Huanyang He, Soumitra Palit, Maria Jose Arias Saavedra, Arshroop Saini. Filed by Ekundayo Alabi, Apoorv Pandkar, Adesola Adeyemi, Naga Swaroop Kota, Gm Shashi, Juily Mahore, Ojasvi Agrawal, Aywan Das, Sarath Boddu, Bhavya Alpeshkumar Patel, Saketh Paruchuri, Judith Ihuoma Ewuzie, Minchuan Wu, Srinivasa Sai Anudeep Gadi, Rebika Basnet, Rahul Cherukuri, Bhavin Patel, Suresh Babu Gadiparthi, Ping-Jui Liao, Pavan Kalyan Reddy Mettupalli, Sona Nikitha Bollavaram, Dorcas Ofori Aidoo, Ramya Krishna Kamatham, Aryan Shah, Tajrian Kamal, Abdlrahman Alabdallah, Anup Mishra, Ritesh Karnam, Shireesh Kumar Gadidesi, Majid Alfifi, Abiodun Oseni, Praveen Pilyanam, Yizhou Chen, Pavan Kumar Jaliparthy, Zhaohua Zhang, Sai Venkata Rithik Antham, Rezvan Golmoradizadeh, Natalia Josefina Martinez Urmeneta, Arindam Roy, Mengqun Yu, Shahbaz Khan, Vikas Reddy Amaravathi, Farrel Gomargana, Aravind Thirunavukkarasu, Nitish Reddy Dakuri, Sharvani Bolla, Nikhil Chowdary Bonthu, Tabrez Khan Mohammad, Armaan Chowdhry, Ukjin Choi, Nengke Lin, Anil Kumar Sharma, Suman Gugulothu, Chang Joon Ahn, Onkar Ashok Mohite, Vomsreemanasa Jalli Venkataramana, Juan Pablo Lopez Ordonez, Sarthak Sanjay Kore, Santosh Kumar Bammidi, Huanyang He, Soumitra Palit, Maria Jose Arias Saavedra, Arshroop Saini. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard) Modified on 4/28/2025 (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 04/28 8:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ekundayo Alabi, Apoorv Pandkar, Adesola Adeyemi, Mahan Naseri, Naga Swaroop Kota, Ramya Krishna Kamatham, Dorcas Ofori Aidoo, Aryan Shah, Gm Shashi, Tajrian Kamal, Juily Mahore, Ojasvi Agrawal, Aywan Das, Abdlrahman Alabdallah, Anup Mishra, Ritesh Karnam, Shireesh Kumar Gadidesi, Sarath Boddu, Majid Alfifi, Abiodun Oseni, Bhavya Alpeshkumar Patel, Saketh Paruchuri, Judith Ihuoma Ewuzie, Minchuan Wu, Srinivasa Sai Anudeep Gadi, Yizhou Chen, Praveen Pilyanam, Pavan Kumar Jaliparthy, Sai Venkata Rithik Antham, Zhaohua Zhang, Rebika Basnet, Rezvan Golmoradizadeh, Rahul Cherukuri, Bhavin Patel, Natalia Josefina Martinez Urmeneta, Arindam Roy, Mengqun Yu, Suresh Babu Gadiparthi, Ping-Jui Liao, Shahbaz Khan, Farrel Gomargana, Vikas Reddy Amaravathi, Aravind Thirunavukkarasu, Nitish Reddy Dakuri, Pavan Kalyan Reddy Mettupalli, Sharvani Bolla, Nikhil Chowdary Bonthu, Sona Nikitha Bollavaram, Seung Jin Kim. Todd M. Lyons served on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025.(Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Service
Saturday, April 26, 2025
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Sat 04/26 12:40 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20612558.) filed by Bhavya Alpeshkumar Patel, Minchuan Wu, Ping-Jui Liao, Sai Venkata Rithik Antham, Shireesh Kumar Gadidesi, Juily Mahore, Dorcas Ofori Aidoo, Gm Shashi, Sona Nikitha Bollavaram, Aryan Shah, Sarath Boddu, Adesola Adeyemi, Praveen Pilyanam, Zhaohua Zhang, Abiodun Oseni, Abdlrahman Alabdallah, Naga Swaroop Kota, Aywan Das, Anup Mishra, Rebika Basnet, Ramya Krishna Kamatham, Tajrian Kamal, Saketh Paruchuri, Apoorv Pandkar, Ekundayo Alabi, Nitish Reddy Dakuri, Judith Ihuoma Ewuzie, Natalia Josefina Martinez Urmeneta, Sharvani Bolla, Vikas Reddy Amaravathi, Bhavin Patel, Arindam Roy, Ritesh Karnam, Suresh Babu Gadiparthi, Yizhou Chen, Nikhil Chowdary Bonthu, Ojasvi Agrawal, Pavan Kalyan Reddy Mettupalli, Pavan Kumar Jaliparthy, Shahbaz Khan, Srinivasa Sai Anudeep Gadi, Majid Alfifi, Aravind Thirunavukkarasu, Rahul Cherukuri, Seung Jin Kim, Rezvan Golmoradizadeh, Mahan Naseri, Farrel Gomargana, Mengqun Yu.(Brown, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 04/24 6:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Todd M. Lyons, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Thu 04/24 6:29 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/23 2:30 PM
Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 04/23 1:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 04/23 12:40 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/23 11:07 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bhavya Alpeshkumar Patel, Minchuan Wu, Ping-Jui Liao, Sai Venkata Rithik Antham, Shireesh Kumar Gadidesi, Juily Mahore, Dorcas Ofori Aidoo, Gm Shashi, Sona Nikitha Bollavaram, Aryan Shah, Sarath Boddu, Adesola Adeyemi, Praveen Pilyanam, Zhaohua Zhang, Abiodun Oseni, Abdlrahman Alabdallah, Naga Swaroop Kota, Aywan Das, Anup Mishra, Rebika Basnet, Ramya Krishna Kamatham, Tajrian Kamal, Saketh Paruchuri, Apoorv Pandkar, Ekundayo Alabi, Nitish Reddy Dakuri, Judith Ihuoma Ewuzie, Natalia Josefina Martinez Urmeneta, Sharvani Bolla, Vikas Reddy Amaravathi, Bhavin Patel, Arindam Roy, Ritesh Karnam, Suresh Babu Gadiparthi, Yizhou Chen, Nikhil Chowdary Bonthu, Ojasvi Agrawal, Pavan Kalyan Reddy Mettupalli, Pavan Kumar Jaliparthy, Shahbaz Khan, Srinivasa Sai Anudeep Gadi, Majid Alfifi, Aravind Thirunavukkarasu, Rahul Cherukuri, Seung Jin Kim, Rezvan Golmoradizadeh, Mahan Naseri, Farrel Gomargana, Mengqun Yu (Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 04/23 11:06 AM
Proposed Summons. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 11:05 AM
COMPLAINT against Todd M. Lyons, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20598698.). Injunction against the US government/official or APA vacatur requested. Filed by Ekundayo Alabi, Apoorv Pandkar, Adesola Adeyemi, Mahan Naseri, Naga Swaroop Kota, Ramya Krishna Kamatham, Dorcas Ofori Aidoo, Aryan Shah, Gm Shashi, Tajrian Kamal, Juily Mahore, Ojasvi Agrawal, Aywan Das, Abdlrahman Alabdallah, Anup Mishra, Ritesh Karnam, Shireesh Kumar Gadidesi, Sarath Boddu, Majid Alfifi, Abiodun Oseni, Bhavya Alpeshkumar Patel, Saketh Paruchuri, Judith Ihuoma Ewuzie, Minchuan Wu, Srinivasa Sai Anudeep Gadi, Yizhou Chen, Praveen Pilyanam, Pavan Kumar Jaliparthy, Sai Venkata Rithik Antham, Zhaohua Zhang, Rebika Basnet, Rezvan Golmoradizadeh, Rahul Cherukuri, Bhavin Patel, Natalia Josefina Martinez Urmeneta, Arindam Roy, Mengqun Yu, Suresh Babu Gadiparthi, Ping-Jui Liao, Shahbaz Khan, Farrel Gomargana, Vikas Reddy Amaravathi, Aravind Thirunavukkarasu, Nitish Reddy Dakuri, Pavan Kalyan Reddy Mettupalli, Sharvani Bolla, Nikhil Chowdary Bonthu, Sona Nikitha Bollavaram, Seung Jin Kim.(Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet