Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:25-cv-80492
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 2:11 PM EDT
Defendant
Claro Insurance, LLC
Plaintiff
Kyle Butler Rashley
Represented By
Avi Robert Kaufman
Kaufman P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 05/05 1:43 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kyle Butler Rashley. Claro Insurance, LLC served on 4/30/2025, response/answer due 5/21/2025. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 04/25 12:48 PM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order of Requirements Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 04/24 4:21 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery.., Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in TCPA case, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order of Requirements Thu 04/24 4:19 PM
ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS IN TCPA-BASED CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 2:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Claro Insurance, LLC. (cwc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/23 2:39 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Claro Insurance, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18392168, filed by Kyle Butler Rashley.(Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)