Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Leslie Abrams Gardner
Case #: 7:25-cv-00051
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY
10275 WEST HIGGINS ROAD SUITE 750
ROSEMONT, IL 60018
Plaintiff
HURST BOILER & WELDING COMPANY, INC.
100 BOILERMAKER LANE
COOLIDGE, GA 31738
Represented By
JEFFREY DALE DIAMOND
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/30 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by HURST BOILER & WELDING COMPANY INC as to EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (DIAMOND, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Jurisdictional Statement Tue 04/29 5:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HURST BOILER & WELDING COMPANY INC, Jurisdictional Statement by HURST BOILER & WELDING COMPANY INC (DIAMOND, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/25 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ROBERT J KAUFMAN on behalf of HURST BOILER & WELDING COMPANY INC Attorney ROBERT J KAUFMAN added to party HURST BOILER & WELDING COMPANY INC(pty:pla)(KAUFMAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/23 2:38 PM
Summons Issued as to EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (ksl)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs misc Complaint (IFP) Wed 04/23 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT (IFP) against EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY filed by HURST BOILER & WELDING COMPANY, INC.(DIAMOND, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit POLICY OF INSURANCE,
Att: 2 Exhibit ARBITRATION AWARD,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet