Chadwick v. State of Nevada et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew P Gordon |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-00711 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER Screening and Serving Petition and Appointing Counsel for Petitioner. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender for the District of Nevada (FPD) is appointed to represent Chadwick. The FPD will have 30 days from the entry of this order to file a notice of appearance or to indicate its inability to represent Chadwick. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the requirement that Chadwick pay the filing fee for this action is suspended. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of the Court to add Aaron Ford, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, as counsel for the respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the respondents will have 30 days from the entry of this order to appear in this action. The respondents will not be required to respond to the habeas petition at this time. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/24/2025. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: AG-Aaron Ford - MAM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE from USDC advising case against State of Nevada et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:25-cv-00711-APG-BNW . ( For Distribution by law library. ) (GA) |
|
1 | 1
![]() RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (GA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |