New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:25-cv-03359
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
HRBA Law LLC, a/k/a HR & Business Associates, LLC
15657 N. Hayden Rd.
Scottsdale, AZ 85260
Defendant
Peter Sayegh, Esq.
15657 N. Hayden Rd. #1010
Scottsdale, AZ 85260
Plaintiff
Lento Law Firm, P.C.
405 Lexington Avenue 26th Fl.
New York, NY 10174
Represented By
Paul Amandio Batista
Paul A. Batista, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph D. Lento, Esq.
1500 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102
Represented By
Paul Amandio Batista
Paul A. Batista, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/24 1:31 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, by May 8, 2025, Plaintiffs shall amend their complaint to properly allege the citizenship of the parties or otherwise file a letter explaining why Plaintiffs need not do so. If Plaintiffs fail to timely allege complete diversity, Plaintiffs' claims may be dismissed sua sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/8/2025.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/24/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 04/24 10:34 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 04/24 10:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 04/24 10:35 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 04/24 10:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Amandio Batista. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/24 10:36 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul Amandio Batista to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple citizenships for the plaintiff and defendant were selected. Office was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/23 2:05 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lento Law Firm, P.C., Joseph D. Lento, Esq...(Batista, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/23 2:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Batista, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT against HRBA Law LLC, a/k/a HR & Business Associates, LLC, Peter Sayegh, Esq.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30974190)Document filed by Joseph D. Lento, Esq., Lento Law Firm, P.C...(Batista, Paul)
Related: [-]