California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:25-bk-13327
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 29, 2025

Debtor
ST Companies Inc., Debtor
2225 Meadowvale Ave
Los Angeles, CA 90031-1108
Represented By
Michael S Kogan
Kogan Law Firm, Apc
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jason M Rund (TR)
Sheridan & Rund 270 Coral Circle
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/23/2025 12:04 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 04/23 11:02 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:25-bk-13327] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58325102. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/23 11:01 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by ST Companies Inc. (Kogan, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 04/23 11:33 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Rund (TR), Jason M with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Rund: Meeting ID 377 810 4184, Passcode 9476458731, Phone 1 213 592 2312. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]