New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:25-cv-03370
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 3:10 PM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
NIRVANA WATER SCIENCES CORP.
Plaintiff
James Fisher
Plaintiff
HALLIE LORBER
Represented By
Jed Matthew Weiss
Mandelbaum Barrett PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/16 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kari Parks on behalf of Nirvana Water Sciences Corp...(Parks, Kari)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 4:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nirvana Water Sciences Corp...(gp)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/05 3:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nirvana Water Sciences Corp., re:3 Complaint. Document filed by James Fisher, Hallie Lorber..(Adler, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 10:51 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nirvana Water Sciences Corp., re:3 Complaint. Document filed by James Fisher, Hallie Lorber. (Adler, Steven) Modified on 5/2/2025 (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/24 11:27 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weiss, Jed)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 04/24 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Nirvana Water Sciences Corp.. Document filed by Hallie Lorber, James Fisher..(Weiss, Jed)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 04/24 9:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jed Matthew Weiss to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the wrong filers were not selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/24 9:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jed Matthew Weiss to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF was not dated and signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 04/24 9:54 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jed Matthew Weiss. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: HALLIE LORBER; James Fisher; NIRVANA WATER SCIENCES CORP.; JOHN DOES 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 04/24 9:56 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 04/24 9:57 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 04/24 9:58 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/23 3:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weiss, Jed)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against NIRVANA WATER SCIENCES CORP.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30974734)Document filed by HALLIE LORBER..(Weiss, Jed)
Related: [-]