California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Michael B Kaufman
Case #: 2:25-cv-03577
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 25STCV06672
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:08 PM PDT
Defendant
STOREBOUND, LLC
Represented By
Matthew P. Houghton
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
WWW.BYDASH.COM
Plaintiff
Judy Oh


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Mon 04/28 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary B. Kaye to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant StoreBound LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 4/25/2025, Receipt No. 39583295)12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District for the practice of law, in which the attorney is physically present on a regular basis to conduct business. (ak)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Mon 04/28 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary B. Kaye to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant StoreBound LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39583295)9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District for the practice of law, in which the attorney is physically present on a regular basis to conduct business. (ak)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 04/28 11:59 AM
Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary B. Kaye to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant StoreBound LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 4/25/2025, Receipt No. 39583295) filed by Defendant StoreBound LLC. (Houghton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
11 11 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 04/25 1:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant StoreBound LLC, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF REMOVAL DOCUMENTS served on April 23, 2024. (Houghton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 04/25 1:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) DEFENDANT STOREBOUND LLC'S ANSWER filed by Defendant StoreBound LLC.(Houghton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 04/25 1:24 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary B. Kaye to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant StoreBound LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39583295) filed by Defendant StoreBound LLC. (Houghton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/24 4:12 PM
DEFENDANT STOREBOUND LLCS NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant StoreBound LLC, identifying Plaintiff Judy Oh and Defendant StoreBound LLC. (Houghton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 04/24 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Zachary B. Kaye. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Thu 04/24 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 04/24 2:44 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 04/24 2:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 04/24 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael B. Kaufman. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/23 12:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant STOREBOUND, LLC. (Houghton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/23 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 25STCV06672 Receipt No: ACACDC-39565045 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant STOREBOUND, LLC. (Attorney Matthew P. Houghton added to party STOREBOUND, LLC(pty:dft))(Houghton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew P. Houghton,
Att: 2 of Glenn De Stefano
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 04/24 2:06 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants StoreBound LLC., filed by Plaintiff Judy Oh. [FILED IN STATE COURT 03/10/2025 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]