California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 2:25-cv-03578
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 1:08 PM PDT
Defendant
8900 Lankershim, LLC
Defendant
Burbank Fireplace & BBQ, Inc.
Plaintiff
Miguel Hernandez
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/28 7:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibility of the parties to maintain familiarity with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/25 10:02 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants 8900 Lankershim, LLC, Burbank Fireplace and BBQ Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/25 9:58 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/25 9:57 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/25 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 04/23 12:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Miguel Hernandez. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/23 12:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/23 12:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Miguel Hernandez. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/23 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39565172 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Miguel Hernandez(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]