California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:25-cv-00844
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 2:08 PM PDT
Defendant
Craven This, Inc.
Defendant
Lori A. Craven-Doss
Plaintiff
Mario Mendoza
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/29 9:30 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge Anne Hwang: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause within fourteen (14) days. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the Courts dismissal of the entire action without prejudice, or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims, and dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 USC section 1367(c). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 04/25 10:20 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Anne Hwang. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and differs in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for details. (ys)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/25 10:03 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Craven This, Inc., Lori A. Craven-Doss. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/25 9:48 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/25 9:47 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/25 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Anne Hwang and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 04/23 1:43 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Mario Mendoza. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/23 1:42 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/23 1:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mario Mendoza. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/23 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 04/23/2025, receipt number 39565528). (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Mario Mendoza(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]